+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0165
- Effective Date July 26, 2021
- Governor Approved
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-004-000
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
- Arrived in House
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 15, 2021
- Second Reading
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021
- Do Pass Transportation; 018-000-000
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
+ − Statute Amended
- 625 ILCS 5/6-105 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 6-105