+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On April 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10(e) to April 9, 2003.
On March 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 2, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2003
- Do Pass Appropriations I; 009-000-000
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Appropriations I
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor