+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 23, 2022
- Second Reading
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 15, 2022
- Do Pass Licensed Activities; 008-000-000
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Licensed Activities
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-assigned to Licensed Activities
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
+ − Statute Amended
- 225 ILCS 410/3-6 - from Ch. 111, par. 1703-6
+ − Vote
February 9, 2022: SB0675 - Licensed Activities
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor