+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On August 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0241
- Effective Date August 3, 2021
- Governor Approved
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000
On May 21, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 023-000-000
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021
- Second Reading
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
- Do Pass as Amended Education; 014-000-000
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1) this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Removes the provision requiring the State Board of Education to provide funding for counselors to support mediation with regard to incidents of bullying that are based on religion, race, ethnicity, or any other category that is identified in the Illinois Human Rights Act.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (5)
May 26, 2021: SB0673 - Third Reading
May 12, 2021: SB0673 - Elem Sec Ed: School Curric Policies
April 23, 2021: SB0673
April 13, 2021: SB0673 - Education
April 13, 2021: SCA0001 - Education
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor