+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (51)
On December 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0600
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date December 6, 2019
On December 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On November 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
On November 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
On November 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
On November 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - November 13, 2019
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Antonio Muñoz
On November 12, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 013-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Insurance Committee; by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On November 8, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones
On November 6, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Insurance Committee
On October 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Muñoz
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
On October 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On October 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On October 29, 2019 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
On October 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 29, 2019
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Muñoz
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As November 14, 2019
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 018-000-000
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
- Second Reading
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019
- Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 001
In provisions amending the Illinois Insurance Code concerning definitions in the Corporate Governance Annual Disclosure Law, makes changes to the definition of "insurer".
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Creates the Corporate Governance Annual Disclosure Law. Requires insurers to disclose corporate governance structure, policies, and practices to the Director of Insurance. Makes corporate governance disclosures confidential and privileged. Revises the Freedom of Information Act to conform to the statutory exemptions found in the Illinois Insurance Code. Effective immediately.