+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (74)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0625
- Effective Date January 24, 2020; Some provisions
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2021; Some provisions
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 043-001-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 3/5 Vote Required
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-013-001
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - November 13, 2019
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Andy Manar
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee; 013-002-001
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi
- Assigned to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Manar
- Third Reading - Passed; 048-007-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Manar
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Will Guzzardi
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Tabled
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As November 14, 2019
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 29, 2019
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Insurance
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Insurance
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 015-003-001
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 015-003-001
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Postponed - Insurance
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2019
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019
- Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the bill as engrossed with the following changes: Removes provisions amending the Attorney General Act. Requires the Department of Insurance in conjunction with the Department of Human Services and the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall make available to the public a report that details each Department's findings regarding insulin pricing practices and variables that contribute to pricing of health coverage plans, and public policy recommendations to control and prevent overpricing of prescription insulin drugs made available to Illinois consumers by November 1, 2020. Effective January 1, 2021, except that provisions requiring an insulin pricing report take effect immediately.
Senate Amendment 003
In provisions amending the Illinois Insurance Code concerning cost sharing in prescription insulin drugs, provides that the definition of "prescription insulin drug" does not include an insulin drug that is administered to a patient intravenously.
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Attorney General Act. Provides that the Attorney General shall investigate the pricing of prescription insulin drugs to ensure adequate consumer protections for Illinois consumers and to determine whether additional consumer protections are necessary. Requires the Attorney General to make the findings available to the public and to report to the Governor, the Department of Insurance, and to the Judiciary Committees of the Senate and the House of Representatives. Provides for the repeal of the Attorney General's investigative duties on December 31, 2020. Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that insurers that provide coverage for prescription insulin drugs must limit the total amount an insured is required to pay for a covered prescription insulin drug to $100 per 30-day supply of insulin regardless of the type and amount of insulin needed by the insured. Provides that the limitation on insulin costs also applies to provisions requiring coverage of certain diabetes items to be subject to the same coverage, deductible, co-payment, and co-insurance provisions under a policy. Makes conforming changes in the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971, the Counties Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, the School Code, the Health Maintenance Organization Act, the Limited Health Service Organization Act, and the Voluntary Health Services Plans Act. Effective January 1, 2021, except that changes to the Attorney General Act take effect immediately.
+ − Proposed Amendments (5)
+ − Statutes Amended (12)
- 215 ILCS 105/1 - from Ch. 73, par. 1301
- 5 ILCS 375/6.11 -
- 15 ILCS 205/10 new -
- 55 ILCS 5/5-1069.3 -
- 65 ILCS 5/10-4-2.3 -
- 105 ILCS 5/10-22.3f -
- 215 ILCS 5/356w -
- 215 ILCS 5/356z.41 new -
- 215 ILCS 125/5-3 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1411.2
- 215 ILCS 130/4003 - from Ch. 73, par. 1504-3
- 215 ILCS 165/10 - from Ch. 32, par. 604
- 215 ILCS 5/356z.42 new -