+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0408
- Effective Date January 1, 2016
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs 057-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2015
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Antonio Muñoz
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Muñoz
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 009-000-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015
- Remains in Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dan Brady
- Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2015
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2015
- Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 010-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
- Assigned to Local Government
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Creates the Coroner Training Board Act. Creates the Coroner Training Board which will have the power to establish application, training, and certification standards for coroners, and to review and approve annual training curriculum for coroners. Provides that the new Board will select and certify coroner training schools, shall conduct or approve a training program in death investigation for the training of coroners, and be allowed to accept contributions and gifts from any organization having a legitimate interest in coroner training. Amends the Illinois Police Training Act and the Counties Code removing the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board from overseeing coroner training and replacing with the Coroner Training Board. Amends the Vital Records Act providing that 25% of the Death Certificate Surcharge Fund may be used by the Coroner Training Board (currently the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board) for the purpose of training coroners, deputy coroners, and forensic pathologists, and police officers for death (currently homicide) investigations and lodging and travel expenses relating to training.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with substantially similar provisions, but provides that public bodies may hold closed meetings to discuss school building safety and security.
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 5 ILCS 120/2 - from Ch. 102, par. 42
- 5 ILCS 120/2 -
- New Act -
- 50 ILCS 705/1 - from Ch. 85, par. 501
- 50 ILCS 705/10.11 -
- 55 ILCS 5/3-3001 - from Ch. 34, par. 3-3001
- 410 ILCS 535/25.5 -