+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (75)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0699
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date November 9, 2007
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 038-001-001
- 3/5 Vote Required
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 038-001-001
- 3/5 Vote Required
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 008-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 008-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Terry Link
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,02 - August 14, 2007
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,02
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Terry Link
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elections & Campaign Reform Committee; 009-000-000
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elaine Nekritz
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elections & Campaign Reform Committee
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jack D. Franks
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 10, 2007
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 4, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 31, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 22, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 15, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 8, 2007
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-005-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2007
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 25, 2007
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Link
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 010-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Local Government
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2007
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 8, 2007
- Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 010-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Local Government
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
- Assigned to Local Government
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
+ − Adopted Amendments (5)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Election Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Election Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the bill as introduced with the following changes: further amends the Election Code. Makes changes with respect to provisions concerning: (i) newspaper publication of consolidated primary ballot nominations; (ii) the deadline for filing a declaration of intent to run as a write-in candidate; (iii) location on ballot cards and sheets of spaces for write-in candidates; (iv) counting of mailed absentee ballots received by an election authority without postmarks; (v) the substitution of in-precinct vote totals reports for in-precinct certificates of results; (vi) the minimum petition signature requirement for local public questions; and (vii) verification of the identity of an early voter. Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. In municipalities with elected presidents and boards of trustees, requires a primary when there are more than 4 (now, more than 2) candidates for each office to be filled. In municipalities that elect a mayor and 4 commissioners, eliminates the primary.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of Senate Amendment No. 1 with the following changes: Further amends the Election Code. Requires that an applicant for State Board of Elections' approval of a voting system or a voting system modification must pay the State Board a non-refundable fee in accordance with a fee structure the State Board must establish by rule. Requires that the vendor, person, or other private entity seeking State Board approval of voting equipment is solely responsible for all application fees. With respect to the changes concerning write-in candidacies, provides that when a sustained nominating petition objection results in a vacancy in nomination after the deadline for filing declarations of intent to be a write-in candidate, permits those filings up to 31 days before the election and requires additional write-in lines on the ballot for those candidates. With respect to the minimum petition signature requirement for placing public questions on the ballot in political subdivisions, increases the percentage of the described voter population from 8% to 11%.