+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0134
- Effective Date January 1, 2016
- Governor Approved
On June 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Small Business Empowerment & Workforce Development Committee; 012-000-000
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Small Business Empowerment & Workforce Development Committee
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2015
- Second Reading
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015
- Do Pass as Amended Commerce and Economic Development; 011-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Commerce and Economic Development
- Postponed - Commerce and Economic Development
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Commerce and Economic Development
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity shall create and maintain a website to help persons wishing to create new businesses or relocate businesses to Illinois. Establishes requirements for information to be included on the website.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (5)
May 14, 2015: SB0659 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 14, 2015
April 21, 2015: SB0659 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 21, 2015
March 26, 2015: SB0659 - Commerce and Economic Development - Mar 26, 2015
March 26, 2015: SCA0001 - Commerce and Economic Development - Mar 26, 2015
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor