+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (22)
- 20 ILCS 2310/2310-222 -
- 20 ILCS 3960/2 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1152
- 20 ILCS 3960/3 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1153
- 20 ILCS 3960/4 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1154
- 20 ILCS 3960/5 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1155
- 20 ILCS 3960/5.4 -
- 20 ILCS 3960/5.5 new -
- 20 ILCS 3960/5.6 new -
- 20 ILCS 3960/6 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1156
- 20 ILCS 3960/6.05 new -
- 20 ILCS 3960/6.2 -
- 20 ILCS 3960/8.5 -
- 20 ILCS 3960/8.7 -
- 20 ILCS 3960/12 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1162
- 20 ILCS 3960/12.3 -
- 20 ILCS 3960/12.4 -
- 20 ILCS 3960/13.1 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1163.1
- 20 ILCS 3960/14 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1164
- 20 ILCS 3960/14.05 new -
- 20 ILCS 3960/14.1 -
- 20 ILCS 3960/14.2 new -
- 305 ILCS 5/5A-17 -