+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (55)
On July 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0119
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 22, 2019
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2019
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
On May 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 079-038-000
- Removed from Short Debate Status
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 015-003-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Insurance Committee; by Voice Vote
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
- Assigned to Insurance Committee
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Thaddeus Jones
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis
- Arrived in House
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Sandoval
- Recalled to Second Reading
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 005-000-000
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
- Second Reading
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019
- Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a health care plan requiring a health care provider to use a time-based Current Procedural Terminology code to bill for health care services shall not apply a time measurement standard that results in fewer units billed than allowed by the Current Procedural Terminology code book, except as required by federal law for federally funded patients. Effective immediately.
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal date of the Illinois Landscape Architecture Act of 1989 from January 1, 2020 to January 1, 2030. Effective immediately.
+ − Proposed Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 220 ILCS 30/1 - from Ch. 111 2/3, par. 401
- 5 ILCS 80/4.30 -
- 5 ILCS 80/4.40 new -
- 215 ILCS 5/368g new -
+ − Votes (7)
May 31, 2019: HCA0001 - Concurrence
May 29, 2019: HCA0001 - Licensed Activities
May 27, 2019: SB0653 - Third Reading
May 22, 2019: SB0653 - Insurance
April 11, 2019: SB0653 - Third Reading
April 10, 2019: SFA0002 - Licensed Activities
March 6, 2019: SB0653 - Executive
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor