+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 105 ILCS 5/10-23.13 -
- 105 ILCS 5/27-9.1a new -
- 105 ILCS 5/27A-5 -
- 105 ILCS 5/34-18.8 - from Ch. 122, par. 34-18.8
- 105 ILCS 5/27-9.1 rep. -
- 105 ILCS 5/27-9.2 rep. -
- 105 ILCS 5/27-11 rep. -
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor