+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On August 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0526
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 12, 2003
On June 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 20, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-001-003
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 23, 2003
On May 8, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 10, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 012-000-000
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On March 25, 2003 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Edward J. Acevedo
On March 21, 2003 in the House:
- First Reading
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Edward J. Acevedo
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 20, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 19, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 6, 2003
- Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
On February 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 720 ILCS 600/2 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 2102
- 720 ILCS 600/4 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 2104
- 720 ILCS 600/6 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 2106
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2003: SB0642 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 20, 2003
March 20, 2003: SB0642 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 20, 2003
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor