+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (76)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0511
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2017
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 26, 2016
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Terry Link
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Terry Link
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 008-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 4, 2015
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 30, 2015
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 31, 2015
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 31, 2015
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2015
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Motion Prevailed
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. John C. D'Amico
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Mulroe
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-001
- Arrived in House
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 15, 2015
- Second Reading
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John G. Mulroe
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015
- Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act. Provides that beginning July 1, 2017, the Secretary of State shall refuse to issue any identification card to any person who has been issued a driver's license under the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that any person may surrender his or her driver's license in order to become eligible to obtain an identification card. Provides that beginning July 1, 2017, all applicants for standard Illinois Identification Cards and Illinois Person with a Disability Identification Cards shall provide proof of lawful status in the United States. Provides that applicants who are unable to provide the Secretary with proof of lawful status are ineligible for identification cards. Provides further criteria for the expiration of Illinois Identification Cards and Illinois Person with a Disability Identification Cards. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code to make similar changes concerning Illinois driver's licenses, except that driver's license applicants who are unable to provide proof of lawful status in the United States may apply for a temporary visitor's driver's license.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Aeronautics Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning definitions.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Aeronautics Act. Provides that the decommission, alteration, destruction, or re-designation of diagonal runways 14R/32L, 14L/32R, 4L/22R, and 4R/22L at O'Hare International Airport is prohibited by any municipality or other political subdivision, or officer or employee of any municipality or other political subdivision. Requires all runways to be maintained and used in a safe and equitable manner for the purpose of fairly distributing air traffic over city and suburban communities surrounding O'Hare International Airport.
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- 620 ILCS 5/6 - from Ch. 15 1/2, par. 22.6
- 620 ILCS 5/6 -
- 620 ILCS 5/47 - from Ch. 15 1/2, par. 22.47
- 620 ILCS 5/47 -
- 620 ILCS 5/1 - from Ch. 15 1/2, par. 22.1
- 15 ILCS 335/2 - from Ch. 124, par. 22
- 15 ILCS 335/5 - from Ch. 124, par. 25
- 15 ILCS 335/8 - from Ch. 124, par. 28
- 625 ILCS 5/6-103 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 6-103
- 625 ILCS 5/6-106 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 6-106