+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (63)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0585
- Effective Date August 26, 2011
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3 - May 31, 2011
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 053-001-001
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 053-001-001
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tom Cross
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2011
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Daniel J. Burke
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2011
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 20, 2011
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2011
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2011
- Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 006-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
- Postponed - Judiciary
- Assigned to Judiciary
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Circuit Courts Act. Provides that the 16th judicial circuit (Kane, DeKalb, and Kendall Counties) is divided into the 16th judicial circuit (Kane County) and the 23rd judicial circuit (DeKalb and Kendall Counties). Provides that the 16th judicial circuit shall have 4 subcircuits (instead of 5 subcircuits) and 7 resident judgeships elected at large. Provides that the 23rd judicial circuit shall have 6 resident judgeships. Contains provisions regarding the assignment or allotment of certain resident judgeships. Provides that an individual seeking a judgeship at large or a judge seeking retention in a judgeship at large in the general election in 2012 shall do so in Kane county.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that, no later than 2 business days following the last day to file an objection to a candidate for judicial office, the State Board of Elections shall remove the home residence address of each Supreme, Appellate, or Circuit Judge, and each candidate for Supreme, Appellate, or Circuit Judge, listed on its website (in the introduced bill, the State Board of Elections was prohibited from posting those addresses).
+ − Statute Amended
- 10 ILCS 5/1A-8 - from Ch. 46, par. 1A-8