+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0734
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2023
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 017-000-000
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
- Arrived in House
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 24, 2022
- Second Reading
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 23, 2022
- Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 007-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As February 25, 2022
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Revised Uniform Unclaimed Property Act. Provides that for an amount held on a payroll card, an indication of owner interest includes wages from an employer under the Illinois Wage Payment and Collection Act in the form of a recurring Automated Clearing House credit previously authorized by the apparent owner. Provides that an Automated Clearing House credit is not an indication of owner interest if the holder assesses fees for account inactivity on the payroll card account.