+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On August 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0296
- Effective Date August 9, 2019
- Governor Approved
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 20, 2019
- Second Reading
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 31, 2019
- Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
May 28, 2019: SB0062 - Third Reading
May 15, 2019: SB0062 - Executive
March 6, 2019: SB0062 - Third Reading
January 29, 2019: SB0062 - Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor