+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On December 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2007
- Do Pass Environment and Energy; 011-000-000
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Environment and Energy
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Held in Environment and Energy
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Environment and Energy
On February 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor