+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On January 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
On December 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On November 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
On October 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
On October 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 29, 2019
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As November 14, 2019
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
- Second Reading
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019
- Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 40 ILCS 5/1-101.1 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 1-101.1
+ − Vote
March 6, 2019: SB0616 - Executive
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor