+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On August 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2022
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0292
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
- Senate Concurs
- Passed Both Houses
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Rights; 006-000-000
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Rights
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 27, 2021
On May 21, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 018-000-000
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 25, 2021
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Human Rights; 009-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 23, 2021
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Rights
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Makes an additional corresponding change in the Election Code.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (13)
- 5 ILCS 140/7.5
- 10 ILCS 5/1A-16
- 10 ILCS 5/19-1 - from Ch. 46, par. 19-1
- 10 ILCS 5/20-3 - from Ch. 46, par. 20-3
- 750 ILCS 61/1
- 750 ILCS 61/5
- 750 ILCS 61/10
- 750 ILCS 61/11
- 750 ILCS 61/15
- 750 ILCS 61/30
- 750 ILCS 61/35
- 750 ILCS 61/40
- 10 ILCS 5/19-4 - from Ch. 46, par. 19-4
+ − Votes (6)
May 30, 2021: HCA0001 - Concurrence
May 29, 2021: HCA0001 - Human Rights
May 26, 2021: SB0593 - Third Reading
May 11, 2021: SB0593 - Judiciary - Criminal
April 21, 2021: SB0593
March 18, 2021: SB0593 - Human Rights
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor