+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Lost 037-074-006
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Second Reading - Standard Debate
On April 30, 2003 in the House:
- Calendar Order 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
- Do Pass / Standard Debate Housing and Urban Development Committee; 011-008-000
On April 10, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Housing and Urban Development Committee
On April 9, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-006-000
On March 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Adopted Executive; 012-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 2, 2003
On March 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass Executive; 007-005-000
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Makes technical corrections. In provisions concerning a property owner's offer for sale of the property to a tenant association, restores current law to provide that the property owner must make such an offer before selling, leasing, or otherwise disposing of the property (instead of before selling, leasing, or otherwise disposing of the assisted housing, completing prepayment, or terminating a subsidy contract or rental restrictions).
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 310 ILCS 60/1 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 1151
- 310 ILCS 60/3 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 1153
- 310 ILCS 60/4 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 1154
- 310 ILCS 60/5 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 1155
- 310 ILCS 60/6 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 1156
- 310 ILCS 60/7 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 1157
- 310 ILCS 60/10.1 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 1160.1
+ − Votes (2)
May 14, 2003: SB0591 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 14, 2003
April 3, 2003: SB0591 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 03, 2003
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor