+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On August 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0213
- Effective Date August 18, 2017
- Governor Approved
On June 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
- Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee;
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
- Second Reading
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
- Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 008-000-000
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue
- Postponed - Revenue
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue
- Postponed - Revenue
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 35 ILCS 145/9.1 new -
- 35 ILCS 145/2 - from Ch. 120, par. 481b.32
- 35 ILCS 145/3 - from Ch. 120, par. 481b.33
- 35 ILCS 145/9 - from Ch. 120, par. 481b.39