+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Executive- Gaming
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor