+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
+ − Statutes Amended (23)
- 5 ILCS 100/1-5 - from Ch. 127, par. 1001-5
- 5 ILCS 100/1-13 new -
- 5 ILCS 100/1-15 - from Ch. 127, par. 1001-15
- 5 ILCS 100/1-30 - from Ch. 127, par. 1001-30
- 5 ILCS 100/10-3 new -
- 5 ILCS 100/10-5 - from Ch. 127, par. 1010-5
- 5 ILCS 100/10-15 - from Ch. 127, par. 1010-15
- 5 ILCS 100/10-20 - from Ch. 127, par. 1010-20
- 5 ILCS 100/10-25 - from Ch. 127, par. 1010-25
- 5 ILCS 100/10-45 - from Ch. 127, par. 1010-45
- 5 ILCS 100/10-50 - from Ch. 127, par. 1010-50
- 5 ILCS 100/10-60 - from Ch. 127, par. 1010-60
- 5 ILCS 100/10-65 - from Ch. 127, par. 1010-65
- 5 ILCS 100/Art. 12 heading new -
- 5 ILCS 100/12-5 new -
- 5 ILCS 100/12-10 new -
- 5 ILCS 100/12-15 new -
- 5 ILCS 100/12-20 new -
- 5 ILCS 100/12-25 new -
- 5 ILCS 100/12-30 new -
- 5 ILCS 100/12-35 new -
- 5 ILCS 100/12-40 new -
- 20 ILCS 415/4c - from Ch. 127, par. 63b104c
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor