+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 21, 2021
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1) this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
- Do Pass as Amended Education; 011-003-000
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Education
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the contents of the bill, but adds a provision concerning the subcontracting of work performed on or about the premises of a charter school to the definition of "union neutrality clause". Effective immediately.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
April 13, 2021: SB0577 - Education
April 13, 2021: SCA0001 - Education
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor