+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0154
- Effective Date January 1, 2022
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Dan Brady
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 011-000-000
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Villivalam
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2021
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 018-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Transportation
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
- Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 014-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
- Postponed - Transportation
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
- Assigned to Transportation
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
Senate Amendment 003
Provides that, no later than July 1, 2022 (instead of July 1, 2021), the Secretary of State shall implement, manage, and administer an electronic lien and title system and establish by administrative rule the standards and procedures relating to the management and implementation of the system.
Senate Amendment 002
Removes language providing that a purchaser of a vehicle who obtains a security interest in a vehicle in good faith for value takes free of any undisclosed liens unless the purchaser has notice of such liens and that, upon the perfection of the security interest, the Secretary of State shall invalidate the undisclosed lienholder's interest in the vehicle subject to an investigation by the Secretary of State Department of Police. Removes language allowing only a licensed dealer to use the reassignment portion included on a certificate of title to reassign a vehicle to another licensed dealer. Makes conforming changes and corrects typographical errors.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the contents of the introduced bill and makes the following changes: Provides that, beginning with the 2023 registration year, upon the request of the vehicle owner, an electric vehicle owner may register an electric vehicle with any qualifying registration, and an additional $100 surcharge shall be collected in addition to the applicable registration fee. Provides that the $100 additional fee is to identify the vehicle as an electric vehicle. Provides that the $100 additional fee is an annual, flat fee that shall be based on an applicant's new or existing registration year for the vehicle's corresponding weight category. Provides that a designation as an electric vehicle shall not alter a vehicle's registration. Provides that $1 of the additional fees shall be deposited into the Secretary of State Special Services Fund and the remainder of the additional fees shall be deposited into the Road Fund. Provides that the Secretary shall adopt any rules necessary to implement the new provisions.
+ − Proposed Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (24)
- 625 ILCS 5/1-213.8 new -
- 625 ILCS 5/3-100.1 -
- 625 ILCS 5/3-104 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 3-104
- 625 ILCS 5/3-104.5 -
- 625 ILCS 5/3-112.1 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 3-112.1
- 625 ILCS 5/3-113 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 3-113
- 625 ILCS 5/3-202 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 3-202
- 625 ILCS 5/3-209 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 3-209
- 625 ILCS 5/3-403 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 3-403
- 625 ILCS 5/3-405.1 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 3-405.1
- 625 ILCS 5/3-506 -
- 625 ILCS 5/3-802 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 3-802
- 625 ILCS 5/3-805 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 3-805
- 625 ILCS 5/3-806.1 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 3-806.1
- 625 ILCS 5/3-806.5 -
- 625 ILCS 5/5-100 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 5-100
- 625 ILCS 5/5-101 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 5-101
- 625 ILCS 5/5-101.1 -
- 625 ILCS 5/5-101.2 -
- 625 ILCS 5/5-102 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 5-102
- 625 ILCS 5/5-102.8 -
- 625 ILCS 5/5-301 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 5-301
- 625 ILCS 5/5-505 new -
- 625 ILCS 5/3-100.2 -