+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2021
- Second Reading
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 23, 2021
- Do Pass Executive; 017-000-000
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
+ − Vote
March 17, 2021: SB0572 - Executive
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor