+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2007
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 25, 2007
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Angelo Saviano
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On March 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 008-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2007
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2007
- Second Reading
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Licensed Activities
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities
On February 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Makes technical corrections.
+ − Statutes Amended (64)
- 5 ILCS 80/4.20 -
- 5 ILCS 80/4.27 -
- 225 ILCS 454/1-10 -
- 225 ILCS 454/5-5 -
- 225 ILCS 454/5-6 new -
- 225 ILCS 454/5-7 new -
- 225 ILCS 454/5-10 -
- 225 ILCS 454/5-15 -
- 225 ILCS 454/5-20 -
- 225 ILCS 454/5-26 new -
- 225 ILCS 454/5-27 new -
- 225 ILCS 454/5-28 new -
- 225 ILCS 454/5-35 -
- 225 ILCS 454/5-40 -
- 225 ILCS 454/5-41 new -
- 225 ILCS 454/5-45 -
- 225 ILCS 454/5-50 -
- 225 ILCS 454/5-60 -
- 225 ILCS 454/5-65 -
- 225 ILCS 454/5-70 -
- 225 ILCS 454/5-80 -
- 225 ILCS 454/5-85 -
- 225 ILCS 454/15-65 -
- 225 ILCS 454/20-5 -
- 225 ILCS 454/20-10 -
- 225 ILCS 454/20-20 -
- 225 ILCS 454/20-21 new -
- 225 ILCS 454/20-22 new -
- 225 ILCS 454/20-25 -
- 225 ILCS 454/20-30 -
- 225 ILCS 454/20-35 -
- 225 ILCS 454/20-40 -
- 225 ILCS 454/20-45 -
- 225 ILCS 454/20-50 -
- 225 ILCS 454/20-60 -
- 225 ILCS 454/20-65 -
- 225 ILCS 454/20-75 -
- 225 ILCS 454/20-85 -
- 225 ILCS 454/20-90 -
- 225 ILCS 454/20-95 -
- 225 ILCS 454/20-100 -
- 225 ILCS 454/20-110 -
- 225 ILCS 454/20-115 -
- 225 ILCS 454/25-5 -
- 225 ILCS 454/25-10 -
- 225 ILCS 454/25-13 -
- 225 ILCS 454/25-14 -
- 225 ILCS 454/25-15 -
- 225 ILCS 454/25-20 -
- 225 ILCS 454/25-25 -
- 225 ILCS 454/25-30 -
- 225 ILCS 454/25-35 -
- 225 ILCS 454/25-37 -
- 225 ILCS 454/30-5 -
- 225 ILCS 454/30-10 -
- 225 ILCS 454/30-15 -
- 225 ILCS 454/30-25 -
- 225 ILCS 454/35-5 -
- 225 ILCS 454/5-10 rep. -
- 225 ILCS 454/5-25 rep. -
- 225 ILCS 454/5-30 rep. -
- 225 ILCS 454/5-55 rep. -
- 225 ILCS 454/20-80 rep. -
- 225 ILCS 454/20-120 rep. -