+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (64)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0615
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 22, 2016
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 31, 2016
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. David Koehler
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 004-000-001
- Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 007-000-001
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Andrew F Skoog
- To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2016
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Koehler
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. David Koehler
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 009-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 2, 2016
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 4, 2015
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015
- Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with changes. Provides that only Enterprise Zones certified in calendar year 2016 shall be effective on the date of certification. Provides that, in 2017 and thereafter, Enterprise Zones shall take effect on January 1 of the first calendar year after the Department's certification. Removes provisions from the engrossed bill providing that the Enterprise Zone application process shall begin 3 years (instead of the current 2 years) prior to the year in which the Zone expires. Effective immediately.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Enterprise Zone Act. Provides that Enterprise Zones shall be effective on the date of certification (instead of January 1 of the first calendar year after certification). Provides that the Zone application process shall begin 3 years (instead of 2 years) prior to the year in which the Zone expires. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 20 ILCS 1105/10 - from Ch. 96 1/2, par. 7410
- 20 ILCS 655/5.3 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 608