+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-assigned to Energy and Public Utilities
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As February 25, 2022
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Cristina Castro
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Rate Reform and Energy
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor