+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (64)
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Withdrawn by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 070-035-004
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 4, 2015
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Fiscal Note Filed (CORRECTED)
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
- Motion Prevailed 068-041-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
- Third Reading - Consideration Postponed
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Request is Inapplicable
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 30, 2015
- Fiscal Note Filed
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 012-000-004
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Ed Sullivan
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Ed Sullivan
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Arthur Turner
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 31, 2015
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hutchinson
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 006-003-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Third Reading - Passed; 037-007-009
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As August 5, 2015
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015
- Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall provide specified child care services (rather than providing those services to the extent resources permit). Adds, to the categories of families to which the Department of Human Services shall provide child care services, families that are income-eligible for child care assistance, are not recipients of TANF, and need child care assistance to participate in education and training activities. Provides that the eligibility requirements for child care assistance services shall be no more restrictive than the eligibility requirements in effect on June 30, 2015. Provides that the Department shall not condition eligibility for child care assistance services upon cooperation in establishing paternity of a child or cooperation with child support collection or enforcement for a child. Provides that, until the Department of Human Services establishes a new co-payment scale by rule, co-payments shall be equal to those in effect on June 30, 2015. Provides that co-payments for child care services may not be increased more than once every 6 months and may not be increased at a rate that exceeds the percentage increase in the Consumer Price Index for all Urban Consumers during the prior calendar year or 5%, whichever is less. Provides that co-payments shall not exceed 10% of family income. Provides that the Department may not adopt emergency rules relating to child care assistance services provided under specified provisions of the Code. Deletes language regarding: an income threshold for FY2007; a test program for certain families to participate in education and training activities; development of a plan to revise the child care assistance program's co-payment scale by February 1, 2008; and authorization to lower income eligibility ceilings, raise parent co-payments, create waiting lists, or other actions to ensure that child care benefits do not exceed the amounts appropriated for those benefits. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. In a provision concerning eligibility for child care benefits under the Department of Human Services' child care assistance program, requires the State to serve all children who fall within the eligibility criteria established by the Department regarding income eligibility and meet the required work or school activity. Deletes a provision that (1) authorizes the Department of Human Services to lower income eligibility ceilings, raise parent co-payments, create waiting lists, or take such other actions during a fiscal year as are necessary to ensure that paid child care benefits do not exceed the amounts appropriated for those child care benefits and (2) permits such changes to be accomplished by emergency rule. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 25 ILCS 5/3 - from Ch. 63, par. 3
- 25 ILCS 5/3 -
- 305 ILCS 5/9A-11 - from Ch. 23, par. 9A-11