+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-assigned to Education
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Education
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam