+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0153
- Effective Date January 1, 2022
- Governor Approved
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 111-000-001
On May 21, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Villivalam
- Recalled to Second Reading
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 007-000-000
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2021
- Second Reading
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 23, 2021
- Do Pass Licensed Activities; 008-000-000
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Provides that if there is any conflict between the provisions of the Illinois Optometric Practice Act of 1987 and the provisions of the Telehealth Act, the provisions of the Illinois Optometric Practice Act of 1987 control. Provides that an optometrist may treat a patient through telehealth in the absence of a provider-patient relationship when, in the professional judgment of the optometrist, emergency care is required. Provides that an optometrist treating a patient through telehealth must perform at least a minimum eye examination (rather than must perform a minimum eye examination) before prescribing eyeglasses or contact lenses to the patient.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 225 ILCS 80/9 - from Ch. 111, par. 3909
- 225 ILCS 80/15.4 new -
+ − Votes (5)
May 26, 2021: SB0567 - Third Reading
May 12, 2021: SB0567 - Health Care Licenses
April 22, 2021: SB0567 - Third Reading
April 21, 2021: SFA0001 - Licensed Activities
March 17, 2021: SB0567 - Licensed Activities
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor