+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On August 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0411
- Effective Date January 1, 2022
- Governor Approved
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Education
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Linda Holmes
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Education; 010-002-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 049-003-000
- Senate Concurs
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2021
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 113-003-000
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
- Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
- Arrived in House
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 046-003-000
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021
- Second Reading
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021
- Do Pass Education; 011-003-000
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
In the provisions relating to courses of study, provides that the teaching of history of the United States shall include the contributions made to society by Americans of different faith practices, including, but not limited to, Muslim Americans, Jewish Americans, Christian Americans, Hindu Americans, Sikh Americans, Buddhist Americans, and any other collective community of faith that has shaped America (rather than the study of the contributions made by Muslims and Muslim Americans to society).
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 105 ILCS 5/24-2 - from Ch. 122, par. 24-2
- 105 ILCS 5/27-21 - from Ch. 122, par. 27-21
+ − Votes (6)
May 30, 2021: HCA0001 - Concurrence
May 30, 2021: HCA0001 - Education
May 27, 2021: SB0564 - Third Reading
May 12, 2021: SB0564 - State Government Administration
April 21, 2021: SB0564 - Third Reading
March 23, 2021: SB0564 - Education
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor