+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (50)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0314
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 7, 2015
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs 056-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 31, 2015
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John M. Sullivan
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John M. Sullivan
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 017-000-000
- Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2015
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 24, 2015
- Do Pass as Amended State Government and Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John M. Sullivan
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Amendment 002
Amends the Personnel Code and the Illinois Human Rights Act. Defines "State agency" and "State employee". Makes changes concerning the membership of the Interagency Committee on Employees with Disabilities. Provides the purposes and functions of the Committee.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes: Further amends the Nursing Home Care Act. Restores language exempting veterans homes operated by the Department of Veterans' Affairs from a provision requiring the Department of Public Health to request a plan of correction from facilities that commit certain violations. In provisions requiring architectural drawings and specifications to be submitted to the Department of Public Health for review before commencing construction of a new facility or specified types of alteration or additions to an existing long-term care facility involving major construction with an estimated cost greater than $100,000, provides that the Department of Public Health shall inform an applicant in writing within 15 working days (rather than 10 working days) after receiving drawings and specifications from the applicant whether the applicant's submission is complete or incomplete. Requires the Department to approve or disapprove completed drawings and specifications submitted to the Department no later than 60 working days (rather than 60 days) following receipt by the Department. In circumstances where an applicant submits additional information in response to written comments from the Department or submits a reconsideration request, provides that the Department shall make a final decision of approval or disapproval within 45 working days (rather than 45 days) after the receipt of the additional information or reconsideration request. Provides that the Department shall conduct an on-site inspection of the completed project no later than 45 working days (rather than 30 days) after notification from the applicant that the project has been completed and all required certifications received and accepted by the Department. Provides that the Department may extend the deadline if a federally mandated survey time frame takes precedence. Provides that the Department shall provide written approval for occupancy to the applicant within 7 working days (rather than 5 working days) after the Department's final inspection. Provides that nothing in the provision shall be construed to apply to maintenance, upkeep, or renovation that does not affect the structural integrity or fire or life safety of the building (rather than the structural integrity of the building). Removes language making certain deadlines for the correction of violations subject to adherence to applicable provisions of State procurement law and the availability of appropriations for the specific purpose. Effective immediately.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Department of Veterans Affairs Act. Deletes language providing that the head of the Division of Women Veterans Affairs shall serve as an Assistant Director of Veterans' Affairs. Makes changes in the provision concerning the Department's powers and duties. Provides that a veteran or spouse, once admitted to an Illinois Veterans Home facility, is considered a resident for interfacility purposes. Provides that the Director of Veterans' Affairs may authorize a Veterans Home to conduct limited fundraising in accordance with applicable laws and regulations for which the sole purpose is to benefit the Veteran Home's member's benefits fund. Permits the Department to operate cemeteries at the Manteno Veterans Home and the Quincy Veterans Home for interment of veterans or their spouses as identified by the Department. Amends the Nursing Home Care Act. Provides that before commencing construction of a new facility or specified types of alteration or additions to an existing long-term care facility involving major construction, as defined by rule by the Department of Public Health, with an estimated cost greater than $100,000, architectural drawings and specifications for the facility shall be submitted to the Department for review. Sets forth provisions concerning applications and departmental review, inspections, and emergency repairs. Provides that for facilities operated by the Department of Veterans' Affairs, certain deadlines for correction of violations are subject to adherence to applicable State procurement laws and the availability of appropriations for the specific purpose. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (17)
- 25 ILCS 130/2-1 - from Ch. 63, par. 1002-1
- 25 ILCS 130/2-1 -
- 20 ILCS 2805/1.2 -
- 20 ILCS 2805/2 - from Ch. 126 1/2, par. 67
- 20 ILCS 2805/2.01 - from Ch. 126 1/2, par. 67.01
- 20 ILCS 2805/2.04 - from Ch. 126 1/2, par. 67.04
- 20 ILCS 2805/2.12 new -
- 20 ILCS 2805/3 - from Ch. 126 1/2, par. 68
- 210 ILCS 45/2-201.5 -
- 210 ILCS 45/3-101.5 -
- 210 ILCS 45/3-202.6 new -
- 210 ILCS 45/3-303 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 4153-303
- 730 ILCS 167/10 -
- 730 ILCS 167/25 -
- 210 ILCS 45/3-303 -
- 20 ILCS 415/19a rep. -
- 775 ILCS 5/2-106 new -