+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0290
- Effective Date August 6, 2021
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Police & Fire Committee; 014-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
- Assigned to Police & Fire Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Ellman
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 009-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021
- Do Pass as Amended Environment and Conservation; 010-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Postponed - Environment and Conservation
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Environment and Conservation
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman
- Assigned to Environment and Conservation
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
Senate Amendment 003
Makes changes to the bill as amended by Senate Amendment No. 1 to provide that any person who operates a refinery or chemical or ethanol plant, a storage and distribution facility, or a tank farm or terminal for flammable liquids, or who has a fixed foam system in use at a manufacturing facility or warehouse, may extend the date of compliance under specified provisions to January 1, 2027 if, prior to January 1, 2025, the person determines that additional time for compliance is needed and sends notice of the determination to the Office of the State Fire Marshal.
Senate Amendment 002
Provides that specified persons and entities must notify the Illinois Emergency Management Agency (rather than submit a report to the Environmental Protection Agency) within 48 hours of a discharge or release. Provides that notifications and surveys shall only include a Fire Department Identification number if applicable. Provides that the Illinois Emergency Management Agency (rather than the Environmental Protection Agency) shall report specified notifications to the Office of the State Fire Marshal. Removes provisions requiring the Environmental Protection Agency to adopt rules for the implementation and administration of the Act. Requires the Office of the State Fire Marshal to conduct the survey of fire departments on or before January 1 of each of the 5 years (rather than annually) after January 1, 2022. Removes language requiring the Office of the State Fire Marshal to assist other State agencies, fire departments, and municipalities in avoiding purchasing or using firefighting agents containing PFAS chemicals that are regulated under the Act. Requires the Environmental Protection Agency to post on its website information regarding the proper methods for (rather than develop a program to assist fire departments in) disposing of Class B firefighting foam containing PFAS.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: Provides that nothing in the Act shall prevent or discourage a fire department from responding to and mitigating incidents where a fire, spill, or leak of a known or suspected flammable liquid has occurred or is believed to be imminent. Provides that specified prohibitions do not apply to the use of Class B firefighting foam containing PFAS chemicals by a fire department while responding to an emergency situation. Requires manufacturers to provide specified notice to fire departments. Removes language requiring manufacturers that produce, sell, or distribute a restricted Class B firefighting foam to recall the product and reimburse the retailer or any other purchaser for the product. Requires the Agency to annually report specified notifications to the Office of the State Fire Marshal. Provides that the Agency shall not adopt any rule that would prevent a fire department from mitigating an emergency incident involving a Class B flammable liquid fire, spill, or leak. Removes information to be included in the Office of the State Fire Marshal's survey of fire departments. Contains provisions regarding the proper disposal of Class B firefighting foam containing PFAS. Removes provisions regarding firefighting personal protective equipment, food packaging and exemptions, and the PFAS Program Fund. Removes language providing that persons who violate the Act are subject to specified civil penalties. Makes other changes.
+ − Proposed Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -