+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On March 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Local Government
On March 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Local Government
On March 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Local Government
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. James A. DeLeo
+ − Statute Amended
- 55 ILCS 5/5-1095 - from Ch. 34, par. 5-1095
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor