+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 19, 2005 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 035-075-001
On May 18, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 12, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue Committee; 008-003-000
On April 27, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
On April 15, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 035-016-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Clayborne
- Recalled to Second Reading
On April 12, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled in Revenue; by Clayborne
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Adopted Revenue; 006-003-000
On April 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
On April 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
On April 6, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 7, 2005
- Second Reading
On March 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 8, 2005
- Do Pass Revenue; 007-003-000
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 19, 2005: SB0556 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 19, 2005
April 14, 2005: SB0556 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 14, 2005
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor