+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 13, 2005 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 27, 2005 in the House:
- Motion Do Pass - Lost Insurance Committee; 006-009-002
On April 26, 2005 in the House:
- Remains in Insurance Committee
On April 20, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Insurance Committee
On April 8, 2005 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On April 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 034-021-001
On April 8, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 16, 2005
- Second Reading
On March 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2005
- Do Pass Insurance; 006-004-000
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
+ − Statute Amended
- 215 ILCS 5/370c - from Ch. 73, par. 982c