+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (49)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0407
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 1, 2016; Takes effect if and only if specified conditions are met on or before July 1, 2016
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs 058-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Insurance; 013-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Insurance
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 22, 2015
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John G. Mulroe
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2015
- Second Reading
- Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 013-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 24, 2015
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
- Assigned to Insurance
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Prefiled with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Amendment 002
In the Illinois Insurance Code, the Health Maintenance Organization Act, and the Illinois Public Aid Code, provides that the term "low-dose mammography" includes (instead of may include) breast tomosynthesis. Removes the immediate effective date and provides that the amendatory Act takes effect on July 1, 2016, if and only if on or before July 1, 2016, (1) the Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services, or its successor agency, promulgates rules or regulations published in the Federal Register or publishes a comment in the Federal Register (A) repealing, amending, or reinterpreting 45 CFR 155.170 to eliminate the State's responsibility to defray the cost of a state-mandated benefit enacted on or after January 1, 2012; (B) requiring qualified health plans, as defined in the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act, as amended by the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010 and any subsequent amendatory Acts, rules, or regulations issued pursuant thereto, to cover breast tomosynthesis as an essential health benefit; or (C) including breast tomosynthesis as a standard as part of the essential health benefits required of benchmark plans under 45 CFR 156.110; or (2) the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act is repealed by an Act of Congress or is invalidated by a decision of the U.S. Supreme Court.
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the introduced bill with the following changes: States that "low-dose mammography" may include breast tomosynthesis (previously does include). Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that screenings for breast cancer under the Code may include breast tomosynthesis. Defines "breast tomosynthesis". Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 215 ILCS 5/356g - from Ch. 73, par. 968g
- 215 ILCS 125/4-6.1 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1408.7
- 305 ILCS 5/5-5 - from Ch. 23, par. 5-5