+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On April 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Lost; 015-036-002
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Cullerton
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
On April 12, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000
On April 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2005
On March 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2005
- Do Pass Judiciary; 007-003-000
On March 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On March 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that no person shall possess or use tobacco in any of its forms in an institution and facility of the Department of Corrections. Provides that the changes to the Unified Code of Corrections and the County Jail Act takes effect on January 1, 2006, and the changes to the Counties Code take effect on July 1, 2006.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 730 ILCS 5/3-7-2a - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-7-2a
- 730 ILCS 5/3-7-2c new -
- 730 ILCS 125/16 - from Ch. 75, par. 116
+ − Vote
April 14, 2005: SB0537 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 14, 2005
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor