+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0377
- Effective Date January 1, 2008
- Governor Approved
On June 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 29, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On May 22, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 9, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 8, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee; 013-000-000
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee
On April 20, 2007 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joe Dunn
On April 18, 2007 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sidney H. Mathias
On April 9, 2007 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 30, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-001
On March 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2007
- Second Reading
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 8, 2007
- Do Pass Judiciary Criminal Law; 008-000-000
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary Criminal Law
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Criminal Law
On February 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Randall M. Hultgren
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kirk W. Dillard
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 625 ILCS 5/6-205 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 6-205
- 625 ILCS 5/6-208 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 6-208
- 625 ILCS 5/6-303 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 6-303
- 730 ILCS 5/5-5-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-5-3
- 730 ILCS 5/5-6-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-6-1
+ − Votes (2)
May 29, 2007: SB0533 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 29, 2007
March 29, 2007: SB0533 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 29, 2007
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor