+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-assigned to Energy and Public Utilities
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 21, 2021
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor