+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (76)
- Session Sine Die
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Karen May
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Environment & Energy Committee; 018-000-000
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-005-000
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,02,03,04
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,02,03,04-May 31, 2008
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Environment & Energy Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Julie Hamos
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2008
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed May 21, 2008
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 23, 2008
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Julie Hamos
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Julie Hamos
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 10, 2008
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 30, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 2, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 12, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 5, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 5, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 24, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 17, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 10, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 4, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 31, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 22, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 15, 2007
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Third Reading - Consideration Postponed
- Removed from Short Debate Status
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed June 5, 2007
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Extended Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 8, 2007
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Julie Hamos
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Julie Hamos
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Environment & Energy Committee; 015-000-000
- Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2007
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2007
- Do Pass Environment and Energy; 009-000-000
- Held in Environment and Energy
- Assigned to Environment and Energy
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with provisions substantially similar to the engrossed bill, except for the following. Provides that each homeowners' association and condominium unit owners' association shall adopt an energy policy statement concerning the location, design, and architectural requirements of solar energy systems or other energy devices. Provides that any entity that complies with the Act is not liable to any other resident or third party for such compliance. In language giving property owners specified rights, deletes language limiting those rights to residential dwellings not exceeding 3 stories in height. Adds language providing that the Act does not apply to a building more than 30 feet in height.
House Floor Amendment No. 2
Amends the Energy Efficient Commercial Building Act. Changes the short title to the Energy Efficient Building Act. Provides that the Code adopted under the Act applies to any new building or structure (rather than any commercial building or structure). Deletes language providing that residential buildings are exempt from the Code. Adds language providing that additions, alterations, renovations, or repairs to existing residential structures are exempt from the Code. Provides that any unit of local government that has adopted the efficiency standards of the 2000 International Energy Conservation Code, with the 2001 supplement, on or before January 1, 2007, may continue to regulate energy efficient building standards under that Code. Adds an immediate effective date.
House Floor Amendment No. 3
Deletes the immediate effective date.
House Floor Amendment No. 3
Deletes the immediate effective date.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -