+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (63)
- Session Sine Die
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,02-November 10, 2004
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,02
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-042-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Julie Hamos
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Housing and Urban Development Committee; 014-004-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Housing and Urban Development Committee
- Fiscal Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- Home Rule Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- Fiscal Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- Sponsor Removed Rep. William B. Black
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Robert Rita
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- State Debt Impact Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- Judicial Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Housing and Urban Development Committee
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Housing and Urban Development Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Housing and Urban Development Committee; 013-005-001
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Kevin Joyce
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Bob Biggins
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Elaine Nekritz
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Mike Boland
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Bob Biggins
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote
- Assigned to Housing and Urban Development Committee
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 31, 2004
- Sponsor Removed Rep. William J. Grunloh
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
- Arrived in House
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. M. Maggie Crotty
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. James T. Meeks
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 18, 2003
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 11, 2003
- Do Pass Executive; 013-000-000
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything. Creates the Rental Housing Support Program Act. Provides for grants from the Illinois Housing Development Authority to local administering agencies to provide subsidies for landlords to charge rent affordable for low-income tenants. Also provides for grants from the Illinois Housing Development Authority to developers of affordable rental housing. Sets forth criteria for the awarding of grants. Requires the Authority to establish an operating reserve for the program. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Rental Housing Support Program Fund, a special fund in the State treasury. Amends the Counties Code. Provides that the county recorder shall collect a $10 surcharge for the recordation of any real estate-related document, one dollar of which shall be retained by the county and 90% of which shall be deposited into the Rental Housing Support Program Fund. Effective January 1, 2005.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything. Creates the Rental Housing Support Program Act. Provides for grants from the Illinois Housing Development Authority to local administering agencies to provide subsidies for landlords to charge rent affordable for low-income tenants. Also provides for grants from the Illinois Housing Development Authority to developers of affordable rental housing. Sets forth criteria for the awarding of grants. Requires the Authority to establish an operating reserve for the program. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Rental Housing Support Program Fund, a special fund in the State treasury. Amends the Counties Code. Provides that the county recorder shall collect a $10 surcharge for the recordation of any real estate-related document, one dollar of which shall be retained by the county and 90% of which shall be deposited into the Rental Housing Support Program Fund. Effective January 1, 2005.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 20 ILCS 3805/7 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 307
- 20 ILCS 3805/7.30 new -