+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
- Session Sine Die
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Assigned to Gaming Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 10, 2008
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 22, 2007
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 15, 2007
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2007
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 25, 2007
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2007
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2007
- Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 009-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
- Postponed - Revenue
- Assigned to Revenue
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act and the Illinois Income tax Act. Authorizes the Illinois Student Assistance Commission to establish systems and programs to encourage employers to match employee contributions to prepaid programs of college savings by making donations to the Commission for prepaid programs of college savings and its programs of grants and loans to make higher education affordable for all residents of the State and to receive, hold, and disburse all such funds made available through those programs for the purposes for which they are authorized by rule or by law. Creates an income tax credit for employers who, during the taxable year, makes a matching donation to the Illinois Student Assistance Commission on behalf of an employee. Provides that the credit is 25% of the matching donation, but not to exceed $500 per employee. Provides that the credit may be carried forward for 3 taxable years. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 15 ILCS 505/16.5 -
- 35 ILCS 5/203 - from Ch. 120, par. 2-203