+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On November 28, 2018 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 8, 2019
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-002-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
On November 27, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
On November 26, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David A. Welter
On November 20, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On November 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On June 21, 2018 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Muñoz
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 017-001-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-001
On May 31, 2018 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
On May 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Muñoz
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2018
On August 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
- Second Reading
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
- Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Proposed Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (12)
- 610 ILCS 5/2 - from Ch. 114, par. 2
- 35 ILCS 105/3-5 -
- 35 ILCS 120/2-5 -
- 35 ILCS 155/2 - from Ch. 120, par. 1702
- 55 ILCS 5/5-1032 - from Ch. 34, par. 5-1032
- 65 ILCS 5/8-11-7 - from Ch. 24, par. 8-11-7
- 625 ILCS 5/11-208.6 -
- 625 ILCS 5/11-208.8 -
- 625 ILCS 5/11-208.9 -
- 625 ILCS 5/11-1201.1 -
- 625 ILCS 7/45 -
- 625 ILCS 27/30 -
+ − Votes (4)
November 28, 2018: SB0514 - Executive
May 31, 2018: SB0514 - Third Reading
May 31, 2018: SFA0002 - Transportation
March 15, 2017: SB0514 - Executive
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor