+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0031
- Effective Date June 25, 2021
- Governor Approved
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 21, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 111-000-000
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 022-000-000
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
- Arrived in House
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 14, 2021
- Second Reading
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 13, 2021
- Do Pass Human Rights; 009-000-000
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Human Rights
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Rights
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
May 21, 2021: SB0506 - Third Reading
May 6, 2021: SB0506 - Appropriations-Human Services
April 21, 2021: SB0506
March 25, 2021: SB0506 - Human Rights
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor