+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On April 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10(e) to April 9, 2003.
On March 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- State Debt Impact Note Filed
On March 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass Executive; 007-004-002
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Executive
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor