+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (53)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-0650
- Effective Date January 1, 2006
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Adopted Transportation; 006-004-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Transportation
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Rickey R. Hendon
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Robert Rita
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-002-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40(a)
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 03
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 03-May 29, 2005.
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2005
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 010-001-000
- Remains in Consumer Protection Committee
- Motion Do Pass - Lost Consumer Protection Committee; 006-004-000
- Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hendon
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 14, 2005
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Adopted Transportation; 006-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rickey R. Hendon
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2005
- Do Pass Transportation; 006-000-000
- Postponed - Transportation
- Postponed - Transportation
- Assigned to Transportation
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rickey R. Hendon
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Re-inserts the provisions of the original bill with changes. Reduces from 30 days to 18 days the period that must expire before the possessor disposes of the vehicle. Provides that only one additional notice to the owner, lienholder, or other legally entitled person is required. Provides that the required notice must be given by first class mail. Provides that, with respect to a vehicle that has been booted and impounded under the Code, a city with a population over 500,000 may establish a program whereby the owner, lienholder, or other legally entitled person shall receive the proceeds of the disposition of the vehicle, less certain specified deductions. Provides that the registered owner, lienholder, or other legally entitled person shall receive the net proceeds of the disposition of the vehicle only if the city establishes the program. Deletes language providing that it is an unlawful practice for a commercial vehicle relocator to fail to make a supervisor available at the office or other location at which relocated vehicles are returned to their owners.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 625 ILCS 5/4-208 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 4-208
- 625 ILCS 5/18a-300 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 18a-300